Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/17/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/17/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/02/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/02/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/02/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 04/02/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/23/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/29/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/29/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 05/06/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/06/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/21/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/21/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/28/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 11/04/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/22/2010
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/22/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 04/22/2010