Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
06/02/2009 Became Public Law No: 111-25.
06/02/2009 Signed by President.
05/21/2009 Presented to President.
05/19/2009 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5645)
03/09/2009 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by recorded vote (2/3 required): 371 - 19, 1 Present (Roll no. 112).(text: CR H3085-3086)
01/06/2009 Introduced in House