Refine your search

Refined by:

Illinois Remove
* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/09/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 03/12/2010
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/15/2010