Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/17/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/17/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/27/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/27/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/27/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 05/07/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/18/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/02/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/16/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/23/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 07/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/23/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/23/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 07/30/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 09/25/2009