Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 03/19/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 06/18/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 06/18/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 06/18/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 06/18/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kirkpatrick, Ann [D-AZ-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/18/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 07/14/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/14/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/14/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/14/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/14/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/14/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 07/14/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/14/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/14/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 07/14/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/14/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 01/26/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 02/24/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 02/24/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/24/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 03/02/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/16/2010
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/05/2010
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/28/2010
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 07/22/2010