Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/04/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/28/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 12/02/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 02/03/2010