Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 03/11/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/16/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/16/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/16/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/16/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/16/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/16/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/16/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/16/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 04/22/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/29/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew