Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 05/13/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/20/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/25/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 07/31/2009