Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 03/16/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 03/16/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/16/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/16/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/26/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/26/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/26/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/26/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/26/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/26/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/02/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 04/29/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/29/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 04/29/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/29/2009
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/29/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/07/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cuellar, Henry [D-TX-28] 05/21/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/21/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/08/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/08/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/24/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 06/24/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 06/24/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/24/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 06/24/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/24/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/07/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 07/21/2009
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 09/15/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 09/15/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 09/29/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/29/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 09/29/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/29/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/20/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 01/27/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 01/27/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 01/27/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/03/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 03/10/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/23/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/14/2010
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 06/23/2010
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/26/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-10] 07/28/2010