Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/10/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/10/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/16/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/17/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/23/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/29/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/13/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/13/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/12/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/12/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/12/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/13/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/13/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/28/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 09/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/10/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 09/15/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 09/22/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 09/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/30/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/30/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/13/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/13/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 10/13/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/13/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 10/14/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/14/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/14/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 10/14/2009
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/14/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/14/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/20/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 10/20/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/21/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/27/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 10/29/2009
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 10/29/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 10/29/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 10/29/2009
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 11/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/02/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 11/03/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/05/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/16/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 11/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 12/01/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 12/01/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 12/01/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 12/01/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 12/01/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 12/03/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 12/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/09/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 12/09/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 12/09/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 12/15/2009
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 12/15/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/16/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 12/16/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 12/16/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/12/2010
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/12/2010
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 01/12/2010
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 01/12/2010
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/12/2010
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/12/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 01/12/2010
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 01/12/2010
Rep. Owens, William L. [D-NY-23] 01/12/2010
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 01/12/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/13/2010
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 01/13/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/26/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 02/02/2010
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/26/2010
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/04/2010
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/08/2010
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 07/14/2010
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 07/21/2010
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 09/22/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/22/2010
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/29/2010
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/15/2010
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 11/15/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 11/15/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 11/15/2010
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 12/07/2010
Rep. Jackson Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 12/22/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 12/22/2010
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 12/22/2010