Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/02/2009
Rep. Adler, John H. [D-NJ-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 05/04/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/20/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/20/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 05/20/2009
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/20/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/20/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/08/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/19/2009