Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/18/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/27/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/28/2010