Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 05/04/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 05/12/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 05/12/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/02/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/11/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 06/11/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/17/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/17/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/18/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/24/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 07/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/10/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/20/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 07/22/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/09/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 09/22/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/22/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 10/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/17/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/15/2010
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/21/2010
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/21/2010
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 04/21/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/05/2010
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/05/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/05/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/06/2010
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/11/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/11/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/12/2010
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 05/24/2010
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 08/10/2010
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 09/28/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/28/2010