Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/05/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 03/12/2009
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 03/17/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 03/18/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 03/23/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/26/2009
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/07/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/21/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 05/21/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 05/21/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/02/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 06/04/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/09/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 06/19/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 06/26/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/14/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/15/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 07/28/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/29/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 07/31/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 09/10/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 10/22/2009
Rep. Perlmutter, Ed [D-CO-7] 02/23/2010
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/19/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 04/29/2010

Show cosponsors who withdrew