Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 03/11/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/11/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/24/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 04/01/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/01/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 06/02/2009
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 07/09/2009