Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/08/2009
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 01/08/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 01/08/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/15/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/21/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 02/10/2009

Show cosponsors who withdrew