Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 03/12/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/12/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/12/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/12/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/19/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/26/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/04/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 06/11/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/25/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Larsen, Rick [D-WA-2] 07/16/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 07/16/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/23/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/31/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/31/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 07/31/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/10/2009
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 09/10/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/10/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 09/10/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 09/24/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/01/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/01/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 10/22/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 10/22/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 10/22/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 10/22/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/16/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/16/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 11/19/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/10/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 12/16/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 12/16/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 01/20/2010
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 02/23/2010
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/04/2010
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 03/04/2010
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 03/22/2010
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 03/22/2010
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/22/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 04/15/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/15/2010
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/06/2010
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 05/06/2010
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/20/2010
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/20/2010
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/08/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/09/2010
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/10/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 06/10/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/10/2010
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/10/2010
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/14/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/21/2010
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/24/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 07/01/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/01/2010
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 07/15/2010
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/15/2010
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/15/2010
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 07/22/2010
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/22/2010
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 07/30/2010
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/30/2010