Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 03/05/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/05/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/06/2009
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/06/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/06/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/17/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/23/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 05/12/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/21/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/11/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/10/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/21/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/09/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 09/09/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/07/2009
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 10/15/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 10/28/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/18/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 12/16/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 12/16/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 01/13/2010
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/19/2010
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/19/2010
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 04/22/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 04/22/2010
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 05/25/2010
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 08/10/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 11/15/2010