There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 38, United States Code, to expand veteran eligibility for reimbursement by the Secretary of Veterans Affairs for emergency treatment furnished in a non-Department facility, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
02/01/2010Became Public Law No: 111-137. (TXT | PDF)
02/01/2010Signed by President.
01/20/2010Presented to President.
12/18/2009Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2009Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S13468-13469)
03/30/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4069)
03/26/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-55.
03/06/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (21)

Date Chamber
02/01/2010Became Public Law No: 111-137. (TXT | PDF)
02/01/2010Signed by President.
01/20/2010HousePresented to President.
12/19/2009SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
12/18/2009SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
12/18/2009SenateSenate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S13468-13469)
03/31/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/30/2009-2:29pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
03/30/2009-2:29pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4069)
03/30/2009-2:21pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1377.
03/30/2009-2:21pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4069-4070)
03/30/2009-2:20pmHouseMrs. Halvorson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
03/26/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 22.
03/26/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 111-55.
03/25/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/25/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/19/2009HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/19/2009HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health
03/13/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
03/06/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
03/06/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/16/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/23/2009

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs03/06/2009 Referred to
03/25/2009 Markup by
03/26/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-55
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Health03/13/2009 Referred to
03/19/2009 Markup by
03/19/2009 Reported by
Senate Veterans' Affairs03/31/2009 Referred to
12/18/2009 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for H.R.1377. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 111-137 (02/03/2010)

(This measure has not been amended since it was reported to the House on March 26, 2009. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Revises provisions concerning the authority of the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to reimburse a veteran for the cost of emergency care provided in a non-Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) facility to provide that, if the veteran has contractual or legal recourse against a third party that would, in part, extinguish the veteran's liability to the provider of the emergency treatment and payment for the treatment may be made by both the VA and the third party, the amount payable by the VA shall be that which exceeds the cost payable by the third party. Prohibits the Secretary from reimbursing a veteran for any copayment or other charge owed to a third party under a health plan contract.

Authorizes the Secretary to reimburse a veteran for the cost of the emergency care described above which is provided before the enactment of this Act, if the Secretary determines that it is appropriate under the circumstances.