Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 03/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/06/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/06/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 05/05/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/05/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/12/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/12/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 05/13/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/13/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/14/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/14/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/21/2009
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/21/2009
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 05/21/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 06/08/2009
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/08/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 06/08/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 09/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/25/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 09/25/2009
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 09/25/2009
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 10/01/2009
Rep. Turner, Michael R. [R-OH-3] 10/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/27/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 10/27/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 10/27/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 10/27/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 10/27/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 10/27/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/27/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 10/27/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 10/27/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3] 10/27/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/27/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 10/27/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 10/27/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 11/17/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 11/17/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 11/17/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 11/17/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/07/2009
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/07/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 12/07/2009
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 12/07/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 12/07/2009
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 12/15/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 12/16/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 01/20/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 01/21/2010
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/03/2010
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 02/04/2010
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 02/04/2010
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/04/2010
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 02/25/2010