Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 01/07/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/07/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 01/07/2009
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 01/07/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/07/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/07/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 01/13/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/15/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/22/2009
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42] 01/28/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 01/28/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 02/23/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/20/2009