There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2009

Short Titles as Reported to House

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2009

Short Titles as Introduced

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To extend Federal recognition to the Chickahominy Indian Tribe, the Chickahominy Indian Tribe-Eastern Division, the Upper Mattaponi Tribe, the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc., the Monacan Indian Nation, and the Nansemond Indian Tribe.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/03/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed by voice vote.
05/12/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-104.
03/09/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (30)

Date Chamber
06/04/2009SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
06/03/2009-2:16pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
06/03/2009-2:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/03/2009-2:16pmHouseOn passage Passed by voice vote.
06/03/2009-2:15pmHouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. (consideration: CR H6115)
06/03/2009-2:15pmHouseThe House adopted the amendment in the nature of a substitute as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. (text: CR H6107-6113)
06/03/2009-2:14pmHouseThe House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 1385.
06/03/2009-2:13pmHouseH.Amdt.161 On agreeing to the Goodlatte amendment (A002) as modified Agreed to by voice vote. (text as modified: CR H6114)
06/03/2009-2:12pmHouseH.Amdt.161 Goodlatte amendment (A002) modified by unanimous consent. The modification to the amendment includes adding certain parcels in Rockbridge County, Virginia to the description.
06/03/2009-2:01pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 490, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Goodlatte #2 amendment.
06/03/2009-2:01pmHouseH.Amdt.161 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Goodlatte. (consideration: CR H6113-6115; text: CR H6113)
06/03/2009-2:00pmHouseH.Amdt.160 On agreeing to the Goodlatte amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote.
06/03/2009-1:59pmHouseDEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 490, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Goodlatte #1 amendment.
06/03/2009-1:58pmHouseH.Amdt.160 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. Goodlatte. (consideration: CR H6113; text: CR H6113)
06/03/2009-1:57pmHousePursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 490, an amendment in the nature of a substitute recommended by the Committee on Natural Resources, now printed in the bill, is considered as adopted as original text for the purpose of further amendment.
06/03/2009-1:12pmHouseGENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 1385.
06/03/2009-1:11pmHouseThe Speaker designated the Honorable Tim Holden to act as Chairman of the Committee.
06/03/2009-1:11pmHouseHouse resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 490 and Rule XVIII.
06/03/2009-1:10pmHouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 31 and H.R. 1385. General debate for both bills is limited to 1 hour equally divided and controlled. For H.R. 1385, specified amendments are in order. For each bill, the previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
06/03/2009-1:10pmHouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 490. (consideration: CR H6101-6115)
06/03/2009-1:09pmHouseRule H. Res. 490 passed House.
06/02/2009-7:07pmHouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 490 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 31 and H.R. 1385. General debate for both bills is limited to 1 hour equally divided and controlled. For H.R. 1385, specified amendments are in order. For each bill, the previous question shall be considered as ordered without intervening motions except one motion to recommit with or without instructions.
05/12/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 50.
05/12/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-104.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/22/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
04/22/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/18/2009HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/09/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/09/2009HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E594)
03/09/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/09/2009 Referred to
03/18/2009 Hearings by
04/22/2009 Markup by
05/12/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-104
Senate Indian Affairs06/04/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1385. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (06/03/2009)

Thomasina E. Jordan Indian Tribes of Virginia Federal Recognition Act of 2009 - Extends federal recognition to the following Indian tribes (the tribes) in the Commonwealth of Virginia and establishes their relationship with the federal government as described below: (1) the Chickahominy Tribe; (2) the Chickahominy Indian Tribe--Eastern Division; (3) the Upper Mattaponi Tribe; (4) the Rappahannock Tribe, Inc.; (5) the Monacan Indian Nation; and (6) the Nansemond Indian Tribe.

Makes the tribes and their members eligible for all services and benefits provided by the federal government to federally recognized Indian tribes. Establishes the service area of each tribe and requirements for each tribe regarding its membership roll, governing documents, and governing body.

Requires the Secretary of the Interior, on request of any of the tribes, to take specified lands into trust for the benefit of that tribe, to be considered part of that tribe's reservation.

Prohibits the tribes from conducting gaming activities.

Prohibits this Act from affecting the hunting, fishing, trapping, gathering, and water rights of the tribes and their members.

Requires Virginia to exercise jurisdiction over all criminal offenses committed, and all civil actions arising, on lands in Virginia owned by, or held in trust by the United States for, the tribes. Authorizes the Secretary to accept all or any portion of Virginia's jurisdiction over such offenses and actions on verification by the Secretary of a tribe's certification that the tribe possesses the capacity to reassume such jurisdiction.

Prohibits the use of eminent domain to acquire lands in fee or in trust for an Indian tribe recognized under this Act.