Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/09/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/11/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/19/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/19/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/24/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/26/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/02/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 04/22/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/22/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 04/29/2009
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/06/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/06/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/07/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/13/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/13/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 05/14/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/14/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/21/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/09/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 06/10/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/16/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 06/25/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 07/07/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/09/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/09/2009
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/10/2009
Rep. Austria, Steve [R-OH-7] 07/13/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/13/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/17/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/21/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/21/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/24/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/24/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/08/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 09/08/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/14/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/14/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/20/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/23/2010
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/15/2010
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/04/2010
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/2010
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 06/16/2010