Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 04/27/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/07/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/04/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 11/05/2009
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/06/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 12/08/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 05/28/2010