Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/09/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 03/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 03/30/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/22/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/22/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/22/2009
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/30/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/03/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/03/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/03/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 06/03/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 06/03/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/03/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/03/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/11/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 06/11/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/11/2009
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 06/17/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/17/2009
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 06/26/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 07/20/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 07/21/2009
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 07/29/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/29/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/17/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 09/23/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 09/29/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 10/07/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 10/08/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/15/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 10/21/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 10/28/2009
Rep. Bright, Bobby [D-AL-2] 12/03/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 01/12/2010
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 01/12/2010
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 02/03/2010
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 02/22/2010
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/22/2010