Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/11/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/24/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/24/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/30/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/30/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/30/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 12/02/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 12/02/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 04/13/2010
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 07/13/2010
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 11/15/2010