Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/17/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/17/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/17/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/30/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 05/06/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 06/09/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/11/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/12/2009