There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Newborn, Child, and Mother Survival Act of 2009

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide assistance to improve the health of newborns, children, and mothers in developing countries, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
03/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (2)

Date
03/10/2009Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (95)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/10/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/10/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT-5]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 03/10/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/11/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/12/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/12/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/22/2009
Rep. Himes, James A. [D-CT-4] 04/22/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/22/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/27/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/28/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 05/05/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/13/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/13/2009
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/14/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 05/20/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/20/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 05/20/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 05/20/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 05/21/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/21/2009
Rep. Tonko, Paul [D-NY-21] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/10/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 06/10/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/16/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 06/26/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/08/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/15/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/23/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 07/28/2009
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 09/08/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 09/10/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 09/24/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/29/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/12/2010
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/12/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/12/2010
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/12/2010
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/28/2010
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/04/2010
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/2010
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/13/2010
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/13/2010
Rep. Kilroy, Mary Jo [D-OH-15] 05/13/2010
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/14/2010
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/21/2010
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/10/2010
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/17/2010

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Foreign Affairs03/10/2009 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1410.


Subjects (6)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1410. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/2009)

Newborn, Child, and Mother Survival Act of 2009 - Amends the Foreign Assistance Act of 1961 to authorize the President to furnish assistance to improve the health of newborns, children, and mothers in developing countries.

Directs the President to develop a comprehensive U.S. government strategy to reduce mortality and improve the health of newborns, children, and mothers in developing countries.

Establishes the Interagency Task Force on Child Survival and Maternal Health in Developing Countries.