Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 03/12/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 03/12/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/21/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/21/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/30/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/07/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/21/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/21/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/21/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 06/26/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/26/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/26/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 06/26/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 10/26/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/17/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/15/2010