Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/10/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/10/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/27/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 04/29/2009
Rep. Lance, Leonard [R-NJ-7] 04/30/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/19/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 10/29/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 04/28/2010