Text: H.R.1422 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Bill Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/10/2009)


111th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. R. 1422

To reauthorize through 2014 certain programs under the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
March 10, 2009

Mr. Smith of Texas (for himself, Mr. Poe of Texas, Mr. Gallegly, Mr. Gohmert, Mr. Sensenbrenner, Mr. Harper, Mr. Rooney, Mr. Coble, Mr. Forbes, Ms. Ginny Brown-Waite of Florida, and Mr. Cardoza) introduced the following bill; which was referred to the Committee on the Judiciary


A BILL

To reauthorize through 2014 certain programs under the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Reauthorization Act of 2009”.

SEC. 2. Reauthorization of child protection programs under the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006.

The Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 (42 U.S.C. 16901 et seq.) is amended as follows:

(1) SEX OFFENDER MANAGEMENT ASSISTANCE (SOMA) PROGRAM.—Section 126(d) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 16926(d)) is amended by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”.

(2) FEDERAL ASSISTANCE WITH RESPECT TO VIOLATIONS OF REGISTRATION REQUIREMENTS.—Section 142(b) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 16941(b)) is amended by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”.

(3) PILOT PROGRAM FOR MONITORING SEXUAL OFFENDERS.—Section 621(c) (42 U.S.C. 16981) of such Act is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”; and

(B) in paragraph (2), by inserting “and after September 1, 2014, but not later than September 1, 2015” after “September 1, 2010,”.

(4) GRANTS TO COMBAT SEXUAL ABUSE OF CHILDREN.—Section 625(d) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 16983(d)) is amended by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”.

(5) JESSICA LUNSFORD ADDRESS VERIFICATION GRANT PROGRAM.—Section 631(e) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 16988(e)) is amended—

(A) in paragraph (1), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”; and

(B) in paragraph (2), by inserting “and after April 1, 2014, but not later than April 1, 2015,” after “April 1, 2009,”.

(6) FUGITIVE SAFE SURRENDER.—Section 632(c) of such Act (42 U.S.C. 16989(c)) is amended by striking “this section—” and all that follows through the period and inserting “this section $8,000,000 for each of the fiscal years 2009 through 2014.”.

SEC. 3. Reauthorization of sex offender apprehension grants and juvenile sex offender treatment grants.

Part KK of title I of the Omnibus Crime Control and Safe Streets Act of 1968 (as added by section 623 of the Adam Walsh Child Protection and Safety Act of 2006 and redesignated by section 114(1) of Public Law 110–199 (122 Stat. 677)), relating to sex offender apprehension grants; juvenile sex offender treatment grants, is amended—

(1) in section 3011(b) (42 U.S.C. 3797ee(b)), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”; and

(2) in section 3012(c) (42 U.S.C. 3797ee–1(c)), by striking “2007 through 2009” and inserting “2010 through 2014”.