There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Reported to House

Wartime Treatment Study Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Wartime Treatment Study Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To establish commissions to review the facts and circumstances surrounding injustices suffered by European Americans, European Latin Americans, and Jewish refugees during World War II.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
12/22/2010Committee on Appropriations discharged.
12/13/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-679, Part I.
03/10/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (15)

Date
12/22/2010Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 415.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/22/2010Committee on Appropriations discharged.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/21/2010House Committee on Appropriations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 22, 2010.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/17/2010House Committee on Appropriations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 21, 2010.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/2010House Committee on Appropriations Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 17, 2010.
Action By: House of Representatives
12/13/2010Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Judiciary. H. Rept. 111-679, Part I.
10/21/2009Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 19 - 7.
10/21/2009Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
07/31/2009Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 9 - 1 .
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law
07/31/2009Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law
04/27/2009Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
03/10/2009Referred to House Appropriations
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2009Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2009Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
03/10/2009Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary03/10/2009 Referred to
10/21/2009 Markup by
12/13/2010 Reported by H. Rept. 111-679
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Immigration, Citizenship, Refugees, Border Security, and International Law04/27/2009 Referred to
07/31/2009 Markup by
07/31/2009 Reported by
House Appropriations03/10/2009 Referred to
12/22/2010 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.R.1425. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/13/2010)

Wartime Treatment Study Act - Title I: Commission on Wartime Treatment of European Americans - (Sec. 101) Establishes the Commission on Wartime Treatment of European Americans to review U.S. government wartime treatment (beginning September 1, 1939, and ending December 31, 1948) of European Americans and European Latin Americans.

(Sec. 102) Requires the Commission to review: (1) government actions with respect to European Americans and European Latin Americans pursuant to U.S. laws and directives, including the Alien Enemies Acts, Presidential Proclamations 2526 (Alien Enemies - German), 2527 (Alien Enemies - Italians), 2655, 2662, 2685 (Removal of Alien Enemies), Executive Orders 9066 (Authorizing the Secretary of War to Prescribe Military Areas) and 9095 (Establishing the Office of Alien Property Custodian), and related directives pursuant to these and other pertinent laws, proclamations, or executive orders; (2) registration requirements, travel and property restrictions, internment, and forced abandonment of property; (3) participation by European Americans in the U.S. Armed Forces; and (4) appropriate remedies, including public education programs and the creation of a comprehensive online database by the National Archives and Records Administration of documents related to the government's wartime treatment of European Americans and European Latin Americans during World War II.

Requires such review to include a list of: (1) all temporary detention and long-term internment facilities in the United States and Latin American nations used to detain or intern European Americans and European Latin Americans during World War II; (2) the names of European Americans and European Latin Americans who died while in World War II detention facilities and where they were buried; (3) the names of children of European Americans and European Latin Americans who were born in World War II detention facilities and where they were born; and (4) the nations from which European Latin Americans were brought to the United States, the ships that transported them to the United States and their departure and disembarkation ports, the locations where European Americans and European Latin Americans were exchanged for persons held in European Axis nations, and the ships that transported them to Europe and their departure and disembarkation ports.

Directs the Commission to hold public hearings in appropriate U.S. cities.

(Sec. 103) Permits the Commission to hold hearings and request attendance and testimony of witnesses and production of records and documents. Authorizes the Commission to request the Attorney General to invoke the aid of an appropriate U.S. district court to require, by subpoena or otherwise, such attendance, testimony, or production.

(Sec. 104) Sets forth administrative provisions authorizing the Commission to appoint personnel and fix compensation, obtain the services of experts and federal government detailees, and enter into agreements to obtain necessary services and supplies.

(Sec. 105) Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 106) Terminates the Commission 60 days after it submits a required report of its findings and recommendations to Congress.

Title II: Commission on Wartime Treatment of Jewish Refugees - (Sec. 201) Establishes the Commission on Wartime Treatment of Jewish Refugees to review the U.S. government's refusal to allow entry into the United States of Jewish and other refugees fleeing persecution or genocide in Europe.

(Sec. 202) Directs the Commission to include (covering the period beginning January 1, 1933, and ending December 31, 1945) reviews of: (1) the rationale for such refusal, its perceived benefit, and its impact on refugees; and (2) federal refugee policy concerning those fleeing persecution or genocide.

Sets forth provisions that parallel title I provisions concerning public hearings, Commission powers, Commission administration, authorization of appropriations, and Commission termination.