Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Reported to House amended, Part I (12/13/2010)

Wartime Treatment Study Act - Title I: Commission on Wartime Treatment of European Americans - (Sec. 101) Establishes the Commission on Wartime Treatment of European Americans to review U.S. government wartime treatment (beginning September 1, 1939, and ending December 31, 1948) of European Americans and European Latin Americans.

(Sec. 102) Requires the Commission to review: (1) government actions with respect to European Americans and European Latin Americans pursuant to U.S. laws and directives, including the Alien Enemies Acts, Presidential Proclamations 2526 (Alien Enemies - German), 2527 (Alien Enemies - Italians), 2655, 2662, 2685 (Removal of Alien Enemies), Executive Orders 9066 (Authorizing the Secretary of War to Prescribe Military Areas) and 9095 (Establishing the Office of Alien Property Custodian), and related directives pursuant to these and other pertinent laws, proclamations, or executive orders; (2) registration requirements, travel and property restrictions, internment, and forced abandonment of property; (3) participation by European Americans in the U.S. Armed Forces; and (4) appropriate remedies, including public education programs and the creation of a comprehensive online database by the National Archives and Records Administration of documents related to the government's wartime treatment of European Americans and European Latin Americans during World War II.

Requires such review to include a list of: (1) all temporary detention and long-term internment facilities in the United States and Latin American nations used to detain or intern European Americans and European Latin Americans during World War II; (2) the names of European Americans and European Latin Americans who died while in World War II detention facilities and where they were buried; (3) the names of children of European Americans and European Latin Americans who were born in World War II detention facilities and where they were born; and (4) the nations from which European Latin Americans were brought to the United States, the ships that transported them to the United States and their departure and disembarkation ports, the locations where European Americans and European Latin Americans were exchanged for persons held in European Axis nations, and the ships that transported them to Europe and their departure and disembarkation ports.

Directs the Commission to hold public hearings in appropriate U.S. cities.

(Sec. 103) Permits the Commission to hold hearings and request attendance and testimony of witnesses and production of records and documents. Authorizes the Commission to request the Attorney General to invoke the aid of an appropriate U.S. district court to require, by subpoena or otherwise, such attendance, testimony, or production.

(Sec. 104) Sets forth administrative provisions authorizing the Commission to appoint personnel and fix compensation, obtain the services of experts and federal government detailees, and enter into agreements to obtain necessary services and supplies.

(Sec. 105) Authorizes appropriations.

(Sec. 106) Terminates the Commission 60 days after it submits a required report of its findings and recommendations to Congress.

Title II: Commission on Wartime Treatment of Jewish Refugees - (Sec. 201) Establishes the Commission on Wartime Treatment of Jewish Refugees to review the U.S. government's refusal to allow entry into the United States of Jewish and other refugees fleeing persecution or genocide in Europe.

(Sec. 202) Directs the Commission to include (covering the period beginning January 1, 1933, and ending December 31, 1945) reviews of: (1) the rationale for such refusal, its perceived benefit, and its impact on refugees; and (2) federal refugee policy concerning those fleeing persecution or genocide.

Sets forth provisions that parallel title I provisions concerning public hearings, Commission powers, Commission administration, authorization of appropriations, and Commission termination.