Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 04/01/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/01/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Jenkins, Lynn [R-KS-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/29/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 03/25/2010
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 09/23/2010