Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/23/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/23/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/23/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/24/2009
Rep. Lujan, Ben Ray [D-NM-3] 03/31/2009
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 03/31/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/21/2009
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 04/21/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/27/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 04/30/2009
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 05/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/12/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/14/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 05/19/2009
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 06/04/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 06/04/2009
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/04/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/04/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/04/2009
Rep. Nye, Glenn C. [D-VA-2] 06/09/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/09/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/09/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/09/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/16/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/16/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 06/16/2009
Rep. Teague, Harry [D-NM-2] 06/16/2009
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/16/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/16/2009
Rep. Perriello, Thomas S.P. [D-VA-5] 06/19/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/19/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/19/2009
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/24/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/24/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 06/24/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/24/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 07/07/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/07/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/07/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 07/07/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 07/07/2009
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 07/10/2009
Rep. Griffith, Parker [D-AL-5] 07/10/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 07/17/2009
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 07/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 07/20/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 07/21/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/31/2009
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 07/31/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 07/31/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/31/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/14/2009
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/14/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/14/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 09/14/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 09/14/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/23/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/23/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/06/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 10/13/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 10/20/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24] 11/07/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/09/2009
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 05/25/2010
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 06/16/2010