Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Olson, Pete [R-TX-22]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 01/07/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 01/07/2009
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 01/08/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/13/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 01/28/2009