Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/11/2009
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/11/2009
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/11/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Kevin [R-CA-22]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 03/11/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. McClintock, Tom [R-CA-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 04/23/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 04/23/2009
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/23/2009
Rep. Rehberg, Denny [R-MT-At Large] 05/07/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 05/07/2009
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 06/10/2009
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/29/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/15/2010