Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 01/07/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/07/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/07/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/09/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 01/09/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 01/09/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 01/09/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/09/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 01/09/2009
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 01/09/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/09/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/09/2009
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/14/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 01/14/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/14/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 01/15/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 02/12/2009
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/02/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/02/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/02/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/03/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/03/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/06/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 03/06/2009
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/06/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/12/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/19/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 04/23/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/23/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/23/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/07/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/13/2010