Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/02/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/02/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/02/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/02/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/21/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/21/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/04/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/04/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/04/2009
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/07/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 06/23/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 07/07/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/22/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/27/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 07/27/2009
Rep. Dahlkemper, Kathleen A. [D-PA-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 09/08/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 09/30/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 10/07/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 11/04/2009
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 11/04/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 11/16/2009
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 11/18/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 12/08/2009
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 01/27/2010
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/22/2010
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-27] 02/22/2010
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/15/2010
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/15/2010
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 03/15/2010
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/25/2010
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 04/20/2010
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 04/20/2010
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 04/20/2010
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/12/2010
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/15/2010
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/21/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/13/2010
Rep. Garamendi, John [D-CA-3] 07/26/2010
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 09/14/2010
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 09/23/2010
Rep. Schrader, Kurt [D-OR-5] 09/28/2010
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/15/2010