Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/25/2009
Rep. Kissell, Larry [D-NC-8] 03/31/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/02/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 04/23/2009
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 04/23/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/28/2009
Rep. Halvorson, Deborah L. [D-IL-11] 05/07/2009