Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 03/11/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 03/19/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/30/2009
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/28/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/11/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/03/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 06/09/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/09/2010