Committees: H.R.1454 — 111th Congress (2009-2010)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Oversight and Government Reform03/12/2009 Referred to
12/07/2009 Discharged from
House Oversight and Government Reform Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, Post Office, and the District of Columbia06/26/2009 Referred to
House Natural Resources03/12/2009 Referred to
06/10/2009 Markup by
12/07/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-358
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Insular Affairs, Oceans and Wildlife03/16/2009 Referred to
05/05/2009 Hearings by
06/10/2009 Discharged from
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs12/08/2009 Referred to
05/17/2010 Markup by
07/27/2010 Reported by S. Rept. 111-234
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs Subcommittee on Federal Financial Management, Government Information, Federal Services, and International Security04/06/2010 Referred to