Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45]* 03/12/2009
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 03/23/2009
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/24/2009
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/24/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/25/2009
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/25/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/26/2009
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 03/26/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/30/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/30/2009
Rep. Sablan, Gregorio Kilili Camacho [D-MP-At Large] 03/31/2009
Rep. Fleming, John [R-LA-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/01/2009
Rep. Pierluisi, Pedro R. [D-PR-At Large] 04/01/2009
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 04/01/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 04/02/2009
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 04/22/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 04/23/2009
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/23/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/27/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Roe, David P. [R-TN-1] 04/28/2009
Rep. Posey, Bill [R-FL-15] 04/28/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Chaffetz, Jason [R-UT-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/28/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/30/2009
Rep. Kratovil, Frank, Jr. [D-MD-1] 04/30/2009
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/30/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 05/04/2009
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/04/2009
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/04/2009
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/04/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/04/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/04/2009
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/04/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 05/05/2009
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 05/05/2009
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/05/2009
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 05/05/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/05/2009
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/06/2009
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 05/06/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 05/06/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/06/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/06/2009
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/07/2009
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 05/12/2009
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/12/2009
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 05/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 05/12/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 05/18/2009
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 05/18/2009
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 05/20/2009
Rep. Lummis, Cynthia M. [R-WY-At Large] 05/20/2009
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 05/20/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 05/20/2009
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 05/20/2009
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/20/2009
Rep. Thompson, Glenn [R-PA-5] 05/20/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 06/02/2009
Rep. McMahon, Michael E. [D-NY-13] 06/02/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/03/2009
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 06/04/2009
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/04/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 06/04/2009
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 06/04/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/08/2009
Rep. Paulsen, Erik [R-MN-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 06/09/2009
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 06/10/2009
Rep. Boccieri, John A. [D-OH-16] 06/15/2009
Rep. Titus, Dina [D-NV-3] 06/15/2009
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/16/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 06/16/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/2009
Rep. Cao, Anh "Joseph" [R-LA-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Nunes, Devin [R-CA-21] 06/19/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 06/23/2009
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 06/24/2009
Rep. Rooney, Thomas J. [R-FL-16] 06/24/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 06/25/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 06/25/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 06/25/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/26/2009
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 07/07/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 07/08/2009
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 07/09/2009
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 07/10/2009
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/13/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 07/14/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2009
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 07/22/2009
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 07/22/2009
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/24/2009
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/30/2009
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/30/2009
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 07/31/2009
Rep. Minnick, Walter [D-ID-1] 09/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 09/22/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 09/22/2009
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 09/29/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 10/22/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 10/29/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/02/2009
Rep. Polis, Jared [D-CO-2] 11/04/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 11/16/2009
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 11/16/2009
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 11/16/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 11/18/2009
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 12/01/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 12/01/2009
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 12/01/2009
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 12/03/2009