Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 03/16/2009
Rep. Connolly, Gerald E. [D-VA-11] 03/16/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 03/16/2009
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/18/2009
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/25/2009
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 03/30/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/2009
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/02/2009
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 04/21/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/21/2009
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/21/2009
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/29/2009
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/29/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/04/2009
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/07/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/07/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/18/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 05/18/2009
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/18/2009
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/19/2009
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 06/02/2009
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/02/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/02/2009
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/04/2009
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 06/04/2009
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA-6] 06/10/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 06/17/2009
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 06/17/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/17/2009
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 06/17/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/18/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/18/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 06/23/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 06/23/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/23/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 06/23/2009
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 06/24/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 06/25/2009
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/26/2009
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/26/2009
Rep. Lee, Christopher J. [R-NY-26] 07/08/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 07/08/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/08/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 07/08/2009
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/08/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 07/08/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/08/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 07/10/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/10/2009
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/13/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 07/14/2009
Rep. Maffei, Daniel B. [D-NY-25] 07/16/2009
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/16/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/21/2009
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 07/24/2009
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/28/2009
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/08/2009
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 09/08/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 09/08/2009
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/08/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/15/2009
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-41] 09/15/2009
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/16/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/25/2009
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 10/08/2009
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 10/20/2009
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 12/09/2009
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 03/03/2010
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/03/2010
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/03/2010
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/03/2010
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/12/2010
Rep. Schauer, Mark H. [D-MI-7] 03/12/2010
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/13/2010
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 04/13/2010
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/22/2010
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/22/2010
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 06/22/2010
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/14/2010
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/20/2010
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 08/10/2010
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 09/29/2010
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/29/2010
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 11/16/2010