Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/17/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/17/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/17/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 03/19/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 03/23/2009
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/30/2009
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 04/01/2009
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 05/12/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/12/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/21/2009
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 06/04/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 06/11/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/12/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 06/15/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/15/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/18/2009
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 07/22/2009
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 07/24/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/29/2009