Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/15/2009
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/15/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/15/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 06/15/2009
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 09/24/2009
Rep. Grayson, Alan [D-FL-8] 09/24/2009
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 10/15/2009
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 10/15/2009
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 01/20/2010
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/20/2010
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/19/2010