Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Kosmas, Suzanne M. [D-FL-24]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/12/2009
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/19/2009
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/19/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/19/2009
Rep. Harper, Gregg [R-MS-3] 03/19/2009
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/19/2009
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/19/2009
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 03/23/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 03/23/2009
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/24/2009
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 03/24/2009
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/24/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/25/2009
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 03/25/2009
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 03/25/2009
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3] 03/25/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 04/01/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 04/02/2009
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 04/02/2009
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/21/2009
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 04/28/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/28/2009
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/29/2009
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 05/05/2009
Rep. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI-9] 05/06/2009
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 05/06/2009
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/07/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/11/2009
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 05/15/2009
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 05/20/2009
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 05/21/2009
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 06/03/2009
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 06/08/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/17/2009
Rep. Guthrie, Brett [R-KY-2] 06/19/2009
Rep. Markey, Betsy [D-CO-4] 06/23/2009
Rep. Coffman, Mike [R-CO-6] 07/13/2009
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 07/15/2009
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 07/24/2009
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 07/31/2009
Rep. Murphy, Scott [D-NY-20] 10/15/2009
Rep. Schock, Aaron [R-IL-18] 12/01/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/12/2010