There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To expand the boundary of the Jimmy Carter National Historic Site in the State of Georgia, to redesignate the unit as a National Historical Park, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/26/2009Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H11744)
10/21/2009Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-307.
03/12/2009Introduced in House

All Actions (16)

Date Chamber
12/14/2009SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
10/27/2009SenateReceived in the Senate.
10/26/2009-2:16pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/26/2009-2:16pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11744)
10/26/2009-2:12pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1471.
10/26/2009-2:12pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11744-11745)
10/26/2009-2:12pmHouseMs. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/21/2009HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 173.
10/21/2009HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-307.
09/30/2009HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
09/30/2009HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/30/2009HouseSubcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged.
05/14/2009HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands
03/16/2009HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
03/12/2009HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
03/12/2009HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (7)


Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Natural Resources03/12/2009 Referred to
09/30/2009 Markup by
10/21/2009 Reported by H. Rept. 111-307
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands03/16/2009 Referred to
05/14/2009 Hearings by
09/30/2009 Discharged from
Senate Energy and Natural Resources12/14/2009 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1471. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/26/2009)

Redesignates the Jimmy Carter National Historic Site in Georgia as the Jimmy Carter National Historical Park.

Requires, in the administration of the Historical Park, the preservation and interpretation of a southern agricultural-based rural community during the early to middle years of the 20th century.

Adds specified real property needed to enhance the visitor experience at the site, including additional acreage surrounding the boyhood home of former President Jimmy Carter.

Authorizes the acquisition, by donation only, of: (1) other lands and interests in the environs of Plains, Georgia, containing natural, cultural, or historic resources consistent with the purposes of the Park; and (2) the Georgia Welcome Center on State Route 280/27.