Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/17/2009
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/17/2009
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/19/2009
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 03/19/2009
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/19/2009
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/24/2009
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/23/2009
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2009
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/23/2009
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/23/2009
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/27/2009
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/27/2009
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 04/28/2009
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/28/2009
Rep. Fudge, Marcia L. [D-OH-11] 04/29/2009
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 04/29/2009
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/30/2009
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/05/2009
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/06/2009
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/06/2009
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/06/2009
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/07/2009
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2009
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 05/13/2009
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 05/13/2009
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 05/13/2009
Rep. Delahunt, Bill [D-MA-10] 05/19/2009
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/19/2009
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 05/19/2009
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/02/2009
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/02/2009
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/02/2009
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/02/2009
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/04/2009
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/2009
Rep. Massa, Eric J. J. [D-NY-29] 06/08/2009
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 06/10/2009
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 06/10/2009
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 06/12/2009
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/12/2009
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 06/12/2009
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/17/2009
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/24/2009
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/26/2009
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/16/2009
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 07/20/2009
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 09/09/2009
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/09/2009
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 09/09/2009
Rep. Driehaus, Steve [D-OH-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Pingree, Chellie [D-ME-1] 10/21/2009
Rep. Chu, Judy [D-CA-32] 10/27/2009
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 11/06/2009
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 11/17/2009
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 12/11/2009
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 12/11/2009
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 12/16/2009
Rep. Quigley, Mike [D-IL-5] 12/16/2009