Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/06/2009
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 01/28/2009
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. Luetkemeyer, Blaine [R-MO-9] 01/28/2009
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 01/28/2009
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 01/28/2009
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/28/2009
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 01/28/2009
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 01/28/2009
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 01/28/2009
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 02/03/2009
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 02/03/2009
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6] 02/03/2009
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/03/2009
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 02/04/2009
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 02/10/2009
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/23/2009